Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/12/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/12/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/20/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/04/2000