Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/23/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/10/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 03/10/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 03/10/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/10/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 03/25/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/11/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 05/11/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/11/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/11/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 09/15/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 10/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/18/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/08/2000
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/08/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/14/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/07/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 10/11/2000
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 12/15/2000