Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/01/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/23/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/23/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 04/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/20/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 04/20/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/29/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 05/18/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/18/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/18/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/27/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/27/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/22/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 09/07/2000