Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/02/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/02/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/02/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 03/02/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/08/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 03/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 03/08/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/11/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/17/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/17/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/17/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/24/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/24/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 03/24/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 04/12/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/12/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 04/12/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/12/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 04/12/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 04/19/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/19/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 04/26/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/26/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/26/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/16/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/16/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/16/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/23/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/23/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/23/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/26/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/05/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/08/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/09/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/21/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/01/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/12/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 10/18/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew