Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 02/23/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/24/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 03/01/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 03/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/01/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/01/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/01/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/01/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/02/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/02/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 03/02/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 03/02/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 03/04/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/04/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/08/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/08/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/08/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/08/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/08/1999