Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 03/18/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/18/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/18/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/18/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/26/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/01/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 07/12/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 07/21/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 07/21/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/21/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/26/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/30/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/03/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/08/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/14/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/14/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 09/22/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 09/22/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/08/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 10/26/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/27/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 11/03/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 11/15/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/29/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/10/2000