Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/24/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 03/03/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/03/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/03/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/10/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/17/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/24/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/13/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/13/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 04/13/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/29/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 05/20/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/25/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 06/30/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 06/30/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/30/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/30/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 07/15/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/22/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 07/22/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/02/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 09/14/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 10/13/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 02/16/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/15/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/10/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew