Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 03/03/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/03/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/09/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/09/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/09/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/18/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/24/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/12/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/27/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/27/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/10/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/30/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 07/12/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/13/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 07/13/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/13/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 07/13/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/19/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/19/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/19/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/22/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/26/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/26/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/26/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 08/02/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 08/02/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 08/02/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/05/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 08/05/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/21/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/05/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/05/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/08/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 11/08/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 11/16/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 01/27/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 01/27/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 01/27/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/02/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 02/02/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/09/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/15/2000
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/15/2000
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/09/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/28/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/28/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/26/2000
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 09/18/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/18/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 10/03/2000