There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

United States-Macau Policy Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To set forth the policy of the United States with respect to Macau, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
02/24/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (7)

Date
03/04/1999Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
03/04/1999Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
02/25/1999Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific
02/25/1999Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House International Relations Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific
02/25/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific.
Action By: Committee on International Relations
02/24/1999Referred to the House Committee on International Relations.
Action By: House of Representatives
02/24/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (5)


Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House International Relations02/24/1999 Referred to
03/04/1999 Markup by
House International Relations Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific02/25/1999 Referred to
02/25/1999 Markup by
02/25/1999 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.825.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.825. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (02/24/1999)

United States-Macau Policy Act of 1999 - Title I: Policy - Expresses the sense of Congress with respect to U.S. policy toward Macau.

Title II: The Status of Macau in United States Law - Declares that U.S. laws (including treaties and international agreements and export controls the President determines is in the national security interest of the United States) shall continue to apply to Macau on or after December 20, 1999, unless otherwise expressly provided by law or by Executive order.

(Sec. 202) Authorizes the President, whenever it is determined that Macau is not sufficiently autonomous to justify treatment under a particular U.S. law different from that accorded China, to issue an Executive order suspending the application of U.S. law.

(Sec. 204) Directs the President to consult with Congress in carrying out this title.

Title III: Reporting Provisions - Directs the Secretary of State to report to specified congressional committees on conditions in Macau of interest to the United States, including: (1) significant developments in U.S. relations with Macau (including the change in the exercise of sovereignty over it affecting U.S. interests there or the U.S. relations with Macau and China; (2) any significant problems or other developments arising with respect to the application of U.S. export controls to Macau; (3) the suspension (or termination of such suspension) with respect to the application of U.S. laws to Macau; (4) the application of treaties and other international agreements to Macau; (5) the development of democratic institutions in Macau; and (6) compliance by China and Portugal with their obligations under the Joint Declaration of the Government of the People's Republic of China and the Government of the Republic of Portugal on the Question of Macau, dated April 13, 1987.