Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/08/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/08/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/14/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/14/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/22/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/12/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/19/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 06/16/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/30/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 07/27/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 09/08/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 09/28/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 10/18/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 10/18/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/14/2000
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/28/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/30/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/05/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 04/06/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/11/2000
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 05/02/2000
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 05/09/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/16/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/23/2000
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/24/2000
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/07/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/20/2000
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 06/20/2000
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 06/28/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/10/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/27/2000
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/27/2000