Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 02/24/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/01/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/01/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 03/04/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/04/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/09/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/15/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 03/16/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/16/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/22/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/22/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 03/24/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 04/12/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/07/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/09/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 09/23/1999