Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/02/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 03/02/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/02/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/04/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 03/04/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 03/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 03/04/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/04/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/10/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/17/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/17/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/17/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/17/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 03/17/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/23/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/23/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/23/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/23/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 03/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/24/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 03/24/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/13/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/13/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 04/13/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/21/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 04/27/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 04/27/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/27/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew