Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 04/12/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 04/14/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/27/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/15/1999