Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 02/24/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/18/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/20/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 04/20/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/20/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/27/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Young, C. W. Bill [R-FL-10] 05/05/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/05/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 05/11/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/11/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/11/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 06/10/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/08/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/12/2000
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/17/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 09/06/2000
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 09/12/2000
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 09/12/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 09/14/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 09/18/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/18/2000
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 09/18/2000
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 09/19/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 09/19/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 09/19/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 09/21/2000
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 09/26/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 09/26/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/28/2000
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 10/03/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 10/03/2000
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 10/03/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/03/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/04/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/10/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/12/2000
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/12/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/24/2000