Committees: H.R.850 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary02/25/1999 Referred to
03/24/1999 Markup by
04/27/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-117,Part 1
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property03/03/1999 Referred to
03/04/1999 Hearings by
03/11/1999 Markup by
03/11/1999 Reported by
House International Relations02/25/1999 Referred to
07/13/1999 Markup by
07/19/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-117,Part 3
House International Relations Subcommittee on International Economic Policy and Trade03/23/1999 Referred to
05/19/1999 Hearings by
07/13/1999 Discharged from
House Armed Services04/27/1999 Referred to
07/12/1999 Hearings by
07/23/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-117,Part 4
House Commerce04/27/1999 Referred to
06/23/1999 Markup by
07/02/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-117,Part 2
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection05/05/1999 Referred to
05/25/1999 Hearings by
06/16/1999 Markup by
06/16/1999 Reported by
House Intelligence (Permanent Select)04/27/1999 Referred to
07/23/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-117,Part 5