Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 03/18/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/18/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/18/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/18/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/18/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/18/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/03/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/06/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/19/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/19/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/19/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/17/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/29/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 11/18/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/09/2000
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/04/2000