Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/25/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 06/24/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/01/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 07/15/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/15/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/15/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 07/15/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/15/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/15/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/15/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/15/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/15/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/30/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/05/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 08/05/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 09/24/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 09/24/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 10/19/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 01/31/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/07/2000
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/29/2000
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/09/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 07/10/2000
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 09/07/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 09/28/2000