Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 05/11/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/20/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/20/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/20/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/20/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/29/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 10/28/1999