Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 02/25/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/11/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 04/20/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 11/16/1999