Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/14/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/20/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/30/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 07/30/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/30/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/30/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/30/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 08/05/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/28/2000