Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/01/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 03/04/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/04/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/04/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 03/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/04/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 03/04/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/11/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 03/11/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 03/18/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/18/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 03/18/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/15/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/15/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/15/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/15/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/15/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/22/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/22/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/22/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 04/22/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/06/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 05/06/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 05/12/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/12/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 05/12/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/12/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/13/1999