Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/01/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/01/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/16/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 03/16/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 03/16/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 03/16/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 03/16/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 03/25/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 03/25/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/29/1999