There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Satellite Access to Local Stations Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To amend title 17, United States Code, to reform the copyright law with respect to satellite retransmissions of broadcast signals, and for other purposes.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
01/06/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (6)

Date
02/25/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
01/19/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Chairman.
Action By: Committee on Commerce
01/06/1999Referred to House Commerce
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/1999Referred to House Judiciary
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/1999Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Action By: House of Representatives
01/06/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (59)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 02/02/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 02/02/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 02/02/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 02/02/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 02/02/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 02/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/04/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 02/04/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/09/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/09/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/09/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/09/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 02/09/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/09/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/09/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 02/11/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 02/11/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 02/11/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/23/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/02/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/02/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 03/02/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 03/02/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 03/02/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/02/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 03/10/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary01/06/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Courts and Intellectual Property02/25/1999 Referred to
House Commerce01/06/1999 Referred to
House Commerce Subcommittee on Telecommunications, Trade, and Consumer Protection01/19/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.89.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.89. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (01/06/1999)

Satellite Access to Local Stations Act - Amends Federal copyright law to cite circumstances under which the secondary transmission by a satellite carrier of a primary transmission of a television broadcast station into the station's local market shall be subject to statutory licensing. Sets forth reporting requirements for a satellite carrier whose secondary transmissions are subject to such licensing requirements.

Precludes any royalty obligation for such secondary transmissions. States that noncompliance with such reporting requirements by a satellite carrier of a television broadcast station is actionable as an act of infringement and fully subject to copyright remedies.

Amends the Communications Act of 1934 regarding the retransmission of broadcasting station signals. Prohibits cable systems and other multichannel video programming distributors from retransmitting a broadcasting station's signal without the station's express consent. Directs the Federal Communications Commission to commence a rulemaking proceeding to revise regulations governing the exercise by television broadcast stations of the right to grant retransmission consent.

Prescribes requirements for the carriage of local television signals by satellite carriers, including: (1) carriage obligations; (2) carriage of all local television stations on contiguous channels and in a nondiscriminatory manner on any navigational device, on-screen guide, or menu; (3) compensation for carriage; and (4) remedies for failure to meet obligations.