Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/03/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14] 03/03/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 03/03/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 03/03/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/03/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Wilson, Heather [R-NM-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 03/03/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 03/03/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 03/03/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 03/03/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 03/03/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/03/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/03/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 03/03/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 03/03/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 03/03/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 03/03/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 03/03/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 03/08/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/08/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/08/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/11/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/12/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 04/12/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 04/12/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 04/12/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/19/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/19/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 04/19/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 04/19/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 04/19/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 04/19/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/19/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 04/19/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/19/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/19/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 04/19/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 04/19/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 04/19/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/19/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/19/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 04/19/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/19/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/19/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 04/26/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/26/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/05/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 05/05/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/22/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/24/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/01/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/18/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 02/10/2000