Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/05/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 05/25/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/08/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/10/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/10/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/12/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 07/12/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 08/03/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 08/03/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 08/03/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 09/13/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/18/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/18/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 10/18/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 10/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 04/03/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 04/03/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/20/2000
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 06/20/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 09/13/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 09/13/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 09/26/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/26/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 09/26/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/04/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/04/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 10/04/2000