Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/01/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 02/01/2000
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/08/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/08/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 02/08/2000
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 02/15/2000
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 02/15/2000
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 02/15/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/08/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 03/22/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/21/2000