Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/02/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 03/11/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/11/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/11/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/11/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/11/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/11/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/11/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/11/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/11/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/11/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 04/13/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 04/13/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/13/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 04/13/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/13/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 04/13/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 04/27/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/27/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 05/26/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/23/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/30/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/30/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/12/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/14/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/14/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 10/18/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/18/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 10/18/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/09/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/13/2000