Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 03/03/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/11/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/11/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/11/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/11/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 05/11/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/11/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/11/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 05/20/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/20/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/20/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/26/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/15/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/15/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 06/15/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/15/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/15/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/01/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/29/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/29/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/29/1999