Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/17/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/17/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/17/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 03/17/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/17/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 03/17/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 03/17/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 03/17/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/17/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/17/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 03/25/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/25/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 03/25/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/25/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/25/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 03/25/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/15/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 04/15/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 04/15/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 04/15/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/15/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 04/28/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/28/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/06/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/12/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/12/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7] 05/12/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 05/20/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/25/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 06/25/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 06/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 07/16/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/16/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/01/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 10/01/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 10/01/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 10/01/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/14/2000
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/15/2000
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/04/2000
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/04/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/04/2000
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 06/28/2000