Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 03/03/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/16/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/16/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/16/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 04/12/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 04/12/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/19/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/19/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 04/27/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/10/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/10/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/26/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 08/02/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/02/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 09/14/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 09/23/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/21/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/25/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 01/24/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 01/24/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/02/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/27/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/10/2000
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/27/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 07/13/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 07/13/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 07/27/2000
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 07/27/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/11/2000
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/10/2000