Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 03/03/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/03/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/18/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/15/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/15/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/31/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 10/05/2000