Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 03/04/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Pease, Edward A. [R-IN-7]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 03/04/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/04/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 03/04/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/18/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 03/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 03/18/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 03/18/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/14/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 05/14/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/14/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/14/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/14/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/14/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/14/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/14/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/14/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/14/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 05/14/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/14/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 05/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/14/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/14/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/16/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/16/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 07/16/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/16/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/30/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 07/30/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 02/16/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/16/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/14/2000