Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 03/11/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 03/25/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 03/25/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 03/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 03/25/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/12/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/12/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/12/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 04/12/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/13/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 04/13/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 04/13/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 04/15/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/15/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 04/15/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/27/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/27/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/27/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 04/27/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/27/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 05/06/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/06/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/06/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/06/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 05/17/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/17/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 05/17/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/17/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 05/17/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/20/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/20/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 06/29/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 08/05/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/08/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 09/22/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 09/22/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/20/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/20/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/20/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/20/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 10/20/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 10/20/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 11/05/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 01/31/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 01/31/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/29/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew