Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 03/04/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/11/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/17/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/25/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 04/13/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 04/13/1999