Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/07/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/16/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/16/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 07/27/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 10/19/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 01/27/2000
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 01/31/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 01/31/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/08/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 02/08/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 02/14/2000
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 02/14/2000
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 02/14/2000
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/09/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/29/2000