Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/26/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/26/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/26/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/26/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/26/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/26/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 06/08/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/08/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/08/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/15/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 06/15/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 06/15/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/15/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/25/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/25/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 07/12/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 07/12/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 07/12/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/12/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 07/12/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 07/16/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/16/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 07/22/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/22/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 08/04/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 08/04/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 08/04/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 08/04/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 08/04/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 08/05/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 08/05/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 08/05/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 08/05/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 08/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/05/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 08/05/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 08/05/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 09/09/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/09/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 09/09/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 09/09/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/09/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 10/01/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 10/01/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 10/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/27/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 10/27/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 10/27/1999