Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/25/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/25/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/25/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/25/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/25/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 11/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 11/18/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 01/31/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 01/31/2000
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 01/31/2000
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/07/2000