Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/27/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/07/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/07/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/07/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 06/07/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 06/15/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/15/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/15/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/15/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/17/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/17/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/22/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/22/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/22/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/23/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/23/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/23/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/24/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 06/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 07/01/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 07/01/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 07/13/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/13/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/13/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/14/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/19/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/19/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/21/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/22/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/22/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 08/04/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 08/04/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/21/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 09/21/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 09/21/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/21/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 09/21/1999