Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 06/08/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/10/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/10/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 06/10/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/14/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 06/14/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/14/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 06/14/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/14/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/14/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/14/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/14/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/14/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 06/14/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/14/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 06/14/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 06/14/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 06/16/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 06/16/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 06/16/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/16/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/16/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/16/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/18/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 06/18/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 06/18/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/18/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/18/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/24/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 06/24/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 06/24/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 06/24/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/30/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/30/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/30/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 07/13/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/13/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 07/27/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 07/27/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/27/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/27/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 08/04/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/04/1999