Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 06/15/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 06/15/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 06/15/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 06/15/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 06/15/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/16/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 06/17/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 06/17/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/18/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/18/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 06/18/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/18/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/23/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 06/29/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 08/05/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/01/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/06/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 03/06/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 03/06/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 03/06/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/06/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/03/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/03/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 05/23/2000
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 06/13/2000
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/10/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 07/18/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/26/2000