Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/25/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/25/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/25/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/25/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/25/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 06/29/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/29/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 07/01/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/20/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/29/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/29/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 07/29/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/29/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 08/03/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 09/08/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/08/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 09/23/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 10/18/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/08/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 02/08/2000