Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 06/22/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 06/22/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 06/22/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/01/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/01/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 07/01/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/01/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 07/01/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 07/01/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/01/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 10/07/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/07/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/07/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/07/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 10/07/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/12/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/12/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/12/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 10/12/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/12/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 10/12/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 10/12/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/12/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/12/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/12/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 10/13/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/13/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/13/1999