Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 06/29/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 06/29/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 06/29/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 06/29/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/30/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 06/30/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/30/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/30/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/30/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/01/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/01/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 07/12/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/12/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 07/12/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/15/1999