Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/28/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 09/28/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 09/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/28/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/28/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 09/28/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 10/13/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 10/13/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 10/13/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 10/13/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 10/13/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/13/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/13/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/13/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/13/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/26/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/26/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/26/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 11/01/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 11/01/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/04/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/04/1999
Rep. Doggett, Lloyd [D-TX-10] 11/04/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 11/04/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 11/04/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 11/04/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/04/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 11/04/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 11/04/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 11/04/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 11/04/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 11/04/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 11/04/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 11/05/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 11/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/05/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/05/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 11/05/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 11/05/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 11/05/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 11/05/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 11/05/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/05/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 11/05/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 11/05/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/05/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 11/05/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 11/05/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 11/05/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 11/05/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 11/09/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/09/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 11/09/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 11/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 11/15/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/15/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 11/15/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/15/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 11/15/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 11/15/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 11/15/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 11/15/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 11/15/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/15/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 11/17/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/17/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 11/17/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 11/18/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 11/22/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 02/01/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 02/01/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/01/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 02/01/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/04/2000
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 05/04/2000
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/08/2000
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/09/2000
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/16/2000
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 06/20/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/29/2000
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 07/26/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/06/2000
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/17/2000