Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 09/22/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 10/06/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 10/06/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 10/06/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/06/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 10/06/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 10/06/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 10/06/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 10/06/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/06/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 10/06/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 10/06/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/06/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/06/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 10/06/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/06/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 10/06/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/06/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/06/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 10/06/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/13/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 10/13/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 10/13/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/13/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 10/13/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 10/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 10/13/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 10/13/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/13/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 10/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/13/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 10/13/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 10/18/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 10/18/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/18/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 10/18/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/18/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 10/18/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/18/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 10/18/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 10/18/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/18/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 10/18/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 10/18/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16] 10/18/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 10/19/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/25/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 10/25/1999