Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 09/27/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 09/30/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 09/30/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/01/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/01/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 10/05/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/07/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 10/19/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/26/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 10/26/1999

Show cosponsors who withdrew