Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 09/30/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 10/05/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 10/05/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 10/07/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 10/18/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 10/20/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 10/21/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/21/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 10/25/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 10/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/25/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 10/26/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 10/26/1999