There are 3 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (1)

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

Expressing the sense of the Congress that prayers and invocations at public school sporting events contribute to the moral foundation of our Nation and urging the Supreme Court to uphold their constitutionality.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
11/02/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote.(consideration: CR H11325-11330)
10/19/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date Chamber
11/19/1999SenateReferred to the Committee on Judiciary.
11/03/1999SenateReceived in the Senate.
11/02/1999-5:10pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
11/02/1999-5:10pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution Agreed to by voice vote. (consideration: CR H11325-11330)
11/02/1999-4:27pmHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H. Con. Res. 199.
11/02/1999-4:27pmHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules.
11/02/1999-4:27pmHouseMr. Bonilla moved to suspend the rules and agree to the resolution.
10/21/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution.
Action By: Committee on the Judiciary
10/19/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on the Judiciary.
10/19/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Judiciary10/19/1999 Referred to
House Judiciary Subcommittee on Constitution10/21/1999 Referred to
Senate Judiciary11/19/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.Con.Res.199.


Subjects (11)


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.Con.Res.199. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (10/19/1999)

Express the sense of Congress that: (1) prayers and invocations at public school sporting events are constitutional under the First Amendment; and (2) the Supreme Court should uphold the constitutionality of such practices.