Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1]* 10/25/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/03/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 11/09/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 11/09/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 11/16/1999