Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 10/26/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 10/26/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Visclosky, Peter J. [D-IN-1]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 10/26/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 11/03/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/03/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 11/03/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 11/03/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 11/03/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 11/03/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 11/09/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 11/09/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 11/09/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 11/16/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 11/16/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 11/16/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/01/2000
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/01/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 02/01/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/01/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 02/01/2000
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/08/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/08/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/22/2000
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 03/22/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/22/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 03/22/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/02/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 05/02/2000
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/19/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/19/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/19/2000
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/19/2000
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/12/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/12/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 09/12/2000
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/12/2000